+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 9, 2016 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0657 Effective from Nov 15, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15062
On November 23, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 15, 2016 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0657
- Final Reading CC
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0970
On November 8, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 7, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0970
On October 28, 2016 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR21-0970
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0970 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Workforce
On October 7, 2016 in the Council:
- PR21-0970 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 15, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor