+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On October 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On October 16, 2020 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0546, Effective from Oct 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 11860
On October 6, 2020 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0546
- Legislative Meeting
On October 5, 2020 in the Council:
- PR23-0968 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh, and Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 6, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor