+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On October 6, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On October 2, 2020 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0513, Effective from Sep 22, 2020 Published in DC Register Page 11326
On September 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0513
- Legislative Meeting
On September 21, 2020 in the Council:
- PR23-0950 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
September 22, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor