+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2015 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0079 Effective from Apr 14, 2015, Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 5447
On April 14, 2015 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0079
- Final Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 18, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0091
On March 13, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0091 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development
On February 27, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0091 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor