+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0716 Effective from Dec 20, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 428
On December 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0716
- Final Reading CC
On December 14, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On December 13, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0904
On November 29, 2016 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR21-0904
On November 4, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 30, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0904 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On September 16, 2016 in the Council:
- PR21-0904 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 20, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor