+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 22, 2018 in the Council:
- Withdrawn
On October 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR22-0889
On October 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 25, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR22-0889
On July 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 15, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0889 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On June 5, 2018 in the Council:
- PR22-0889 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor