+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 21, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0649 Effective from Oct 28, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 11963
On October 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0649
- Final Reading, CC
On October 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0837
On June 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On June 13, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0837 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 6, 2014 in the Council:
- PR20-0837 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 28, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor