+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Resolution R22-0479 Effective from Apr 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 4315
On April 17, 2018 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On April 10, 2018 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0479
- Final Reading
On April 9, 2018 in the Council:
- PR22-0825 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson and Councilmember Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 10, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor