+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 30, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On June 19, 2020 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0429, Effective from Jun 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7741
On June 9, 2020 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0429
- Legislative Meeting
On June 8, 2020 in the Council:
- PR23-0825 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh, Nadeau, and Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 9, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes