+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0630, Effective from Oct 04, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 012737
On October 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0630
- Legislative Meeting
On September 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On September 16, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0796
On June 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On June 17, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0796 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 8, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-0796 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 4, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor