+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On July 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0534, Effective from Jun 28, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008421
On June 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0534
- Legislative Meeting
On June 10, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0790 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Housing and Executive Administration
On June 3, 2022 in the Council:
- PR24-0790 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 28, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor