+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0532 Effective from Jul 14, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8329
On July 25, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0532
- Final Reading, CC
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0787
On June 25, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR20-0787
On June 6, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 30, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0787 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On May 19, 2014 in the Council:
- PR20-0787 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 14, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor