+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0396, Effective from Apr 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4288
On April 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0396
- Legislative Meeting
On March 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Health
On February 27, 2020 in the Council:
- PR23-0741 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 7, 2020: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor