+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Resolution R22-0428 Effective from Mar 6, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2652
On March 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0428
On February 13, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR22-0664
On February 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR22-0664
On February 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 19, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On December 15, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0664 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 4, 2017 in the Council:
- PR22-0664 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 6, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor