+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 19, 2013 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0092 Effective from Apr 9, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 5788
On April 9, 2013 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0092
- Final Reading
On April 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0066
On March 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0066
On March 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0066 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
On January 25, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0066 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 9, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor