+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0445 Effective from Apr 5, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9025
On June 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On April 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0445
- Final Reading CC
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0528
On March 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR21-0528
On February 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 22, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0528 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 19, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the Council:
- PR21-0528 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 5, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor