+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 1, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0538 Effective from Jul 14, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 7805
On July 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0538
- Final Reading, CC
On July 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0491
On June 26, 2014 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0491 View Video :
On June 6, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 30, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On October 11, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0491 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 2, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0491 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 14, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor