+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0444 Effective from Apr 8, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3921
On April 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0444
- Final Reading, CC
On March 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0490
On January 16, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR20-0490
On November 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On October 11, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0490 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 2, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0490 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 8, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor