+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0250, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15187
On November 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0250
- Legislative Meeting
On October 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0471 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
On September 30, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0471 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 5, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor