+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2021 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0044, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 002646
On March 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0044
- Legislative Meeting
On February 25, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On February 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0046
- Mark-up on PR24-0046
On February 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On February 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR24-0046
On February 8, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable filed in the Office of Secretary
On January 29, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0046 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration
On January 15, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0046 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 2, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor