+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 20, 2013 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0350 Effective from Dec 3, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 16952
On December 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0350
- Final Reading
On November 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0456
On October 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0456 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Economic Development
On September 19, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0456 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 3, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor