+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0323 Effective from Nov 5, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15803
On November 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0323
- Final Reading
On October 31, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0443
On October 9, 2013 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0443 View Video :
On October 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
On September 27, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0443 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 17, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0443 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 5, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor