+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0253, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 15357 and Page 15357
On November 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0253
- Legislative Meeting
On October 30, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On October 23, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0422
On October 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR23-0422
On September 13, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 12, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0422 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement
On July 2, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0422 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 5, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor