+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On September 27, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0212, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12643
On September 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0212
- Legislative Meeting
On July 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Finance and Revenue, and Committee of the Whole
On July 2, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0421 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
September 17, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor