+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2015 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0318 Effective from Dec 1, 2015, Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 16050
On December 1, 2015 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0318
- Final Reading
On November 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On November 19, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0414
On November 13, 2015 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR21-0414
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0414 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
On November 2, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0414 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 1, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor