+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0257, Effective from Nov 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15361
On November 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0257
- Legislative Meeting
On October 30, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0377
On October 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR23-0377 View Roundtable Record
On September 27, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 21, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0377 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 18, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On June 14, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0377 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 5, 2019: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor