+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0170, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8284
On July 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0170
- Legislative Meeting
On July 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0373
On June 21, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0373 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 18, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On June 14, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0373 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 9, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor