+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0026, Effective from Feb 19, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2475
On February 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0026
- Legislative Meeting
On February 12, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0037
On January 30, 2019 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR23-0037 View Roundtable Record
On January 25, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0037 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement
On January 2, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0037 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 19, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor