+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2015 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0299 Effective from Dec 1, 2015, Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 16023
On December 1, 2015 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0299
- Final Reading CC
On November 30, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0367
On November 4, 2015 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR21-0367
On October 23, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0367 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 6, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On October 5, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0367 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 1, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor