+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Resolution R22-0259 Effective from Nov 7, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 19
On November 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0259
On October 17, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 13, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR22-0360
On September 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR22-0360
On September 8, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 20, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On June 16, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0360 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 5, 2017 in the Council:
- PR22-0360 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 7, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor