+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 29, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0202, Effective from Sep 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15704
On November 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On September 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0202
- Legislative Meeting
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0359
On July 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR23-0359 View Roundtable Record
On July 5, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 21, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0359 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 18, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On June 7, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0359 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
September 17, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor