+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0255 Effective from Nov 3, 2015, Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 15027
On November 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0255
- Final Reading CC
On October 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On October 21, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0355
On October 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0355 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 6, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development
On September 30, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0355 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 3, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor