+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0270
- Legislative Meeting
On October 20, 2021 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR24-0352
On September 24, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 20, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable filed in the Office of Secretary
On August 13, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0352 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On August 10, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On July 13, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0352 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 2, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor