+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 16, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R23-0165, Effective from Jul 09, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 10506
On July 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R23-0165
- Legislative Meeting
On July 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of PR23-0300
On June 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR23-0300
On June 14, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0300 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 7, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On May 6, 2019 in the Council:
- PR23-0300 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 9, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor