+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 23, 2013 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0225 Effective from Jul 10, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 12182
On July 10, 2013 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0225
- Final Reading
On July 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR20-0292
On June 12, 2013 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0292
On June 7, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On May 31, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0292 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 22, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0292 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 10, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor