+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 28, 2013 in the Council:
- Resolution R20-0174 Effective from Jun 18, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 9668
On June 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R20-0174
- Final ReadingÂ
On June 6, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR20-0269
On May 17, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 7, 2013 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On May 2, 2013 in the Council:
- PR20-0269 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 18, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor