+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0028 Effective from Mar 3, 2015 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 3628
On March 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0028
- Final Reading CC
On February 26, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On February 25, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0025
On February 11, 2015 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR21-0025
On February 6, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 30, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0025 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development
On January 16, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0025 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 3, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor