+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0116, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006115
On June 1, 2021 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0116
- Legislative Meeting
On May 21, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0234 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 18, 2021 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Housing and Executive Administration
On May 13, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0234 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 1, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor