+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 28, 2017 in the Council:
- Resolution R22-0176 Effective from Jul 11, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7166
On July 11, 2017 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0176
- Final Reading CC
On July 5, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR22-0230
- Committee Report Filed
On June 14, 2017 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR22-0230
On June 9, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0230 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 4, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
On April 3, 2017 in the Council:
- PR22-0230 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 11, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor