+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 9, 2021 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0141, Effective from Jun 29, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006792
On June 29, 2021 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0141
- Legislative Meeting
On June 24, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On June 16, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0196
- Mark-up on PR24-0196
On June 15, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On May 10, 2021 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on PR24-0196
On April 30, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 27, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On April 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0196 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 20, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On April 19, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0196 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 29, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor