+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2021 in the Council:
- Resolution R24-0049, Effective from Mar 02, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 002653
On March 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0049
- Legislative Meeting
On February 24, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On February 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR24-0019
On February 18, 2021 in the Council:
- Roundtable on PR24-0019
On February 12, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 9, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable filed in the Office of Secretary
On January 8, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0019 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 1, 2020 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration
On November 23, 2020 in the Council:
- PR24-0019 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 2, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 4
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Present
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Present
- Brooke Pinto: Present
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Present
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor