+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 1, 2015 in the Council:
- Resolution R21-0066 Effective from Apr 14, 2015, Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 5433
On April 14, 2015 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R21-0066
- Final Reading CC
On March 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 4, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0019
On February 11, 2015 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR21-0019
On February 6, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 30, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0019 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
On January 16, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0019 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor