+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 12, 2017 in the Council:
- Resolution R22-0083 Effective from May 2, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4547
On May 2, 2017 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0083
On April 25, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On April 6, 2017 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR22-0182
On April 5, 2017 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR22-0182
On March 31, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 24, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0182 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 21, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On March 15, 2017 in the Council:
- PR22-0182 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
May 2, 2017: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor