+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Approved with Resolution Number R24-0373
- Legislative Meeting
On October 8, 2021 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published.
On October 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0154 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 6, 2021 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee of the Whole
On April 5, 2021 in the Council:
- PR24-0154 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson, Councilmembers McDuffie, T. White, Pinto, Silverman, Gray, Allen, Bonds, Lewis George, Henderson, Nadeau, Cheh, and R. White at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 1, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor