+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 10, 2015 in the Council:
- Withdrawn
On July 8, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 7, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR21-0109
On July 2, 2015 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR21-0109
On June 19, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 5, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 14, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On March 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0109 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 17, 2015 in the Council:
- PR21-0109 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor