+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 4, 2019 in the Council:
- Resolution R22-0695 Effective from Dec 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13
On December 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Final reading CC
- Approved with Resolution Number R22-0695
On December 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of PR22-1025
- Committee Report Filed
On December 11, 2018 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on PR22-1025
On December 7, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1025 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On September 27, 2018 in the Council:
- PR22-1025 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 18, 2018: Final reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor