+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 27, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0482 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13858, Expires on Feb 14, 2021
On November 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0482, Expires on Feb 14, 2021
On November 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On November 2, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 17, 2020
On October 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On October 19, 2020 in the Council:
- B23-0978 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 20, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor