+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0016 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 3847, Expires on Jun 23, 2015
On March 27, 2015 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On March 26, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0016, Expires on Jun 23, 2015
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0016, Expires on Jun 23, 2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 31, 2015
- Retained by the Council
On March 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On March 2, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0097 Introduced by Councilmember Orange at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 3, 2015: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor