+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0018 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 3972, Expires on Jun 3, 2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0018, Expires on Jun 3, 2013
On March 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 4, 2013
On February 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- Retained by the Council
- B20-0096 Introduced by Councilmembers Bonds, Grosso, and McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 5, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1