+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 7, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is May 23, 2019
On February 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A22-0594 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 1402
On January 23, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0594
- Signed with Act Number A22-0594
On January 10, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 25, 2019
On December 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Amendment (Evans)
- Amendment (McDuffie)
- Final Reading
On December 4, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading
- Amendment (R. White)
- Amendment (Allen)
On November 28, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0944
- Committee Report Filed
On October 17, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0944
On September 28, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0944 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 18, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-0944 Introduced by Councilmembers Evans, Todd, R. White, Cheh, Gray, and Bonds at Committee of
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
+ − Votes (6)
December 18, 2018: Amendment (Evans)
- Yeas: 13
December 18, 2018: Amendment (McDuffie)
- Yeas: 13
December 18, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
December 4, 2018: Amendment (R. White)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
December 4, 2018: Amendment (Allen)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
December 4, 2018: First Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1